+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/4/00
- 11:50AM 5/30/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 123 SLA 00
On May 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/2/00
On April 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/1/00
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/30/00
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/29/00
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/28/00
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/27/00
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/26/00
On April 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/25/00
On April 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/00
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 259(FIN)
- KELLY, TIM NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM #2)
- NR: ADAMS, WILKEN
- PETE KELLY, LEMAN, DONLEY;
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, GREEN,
- FIN RPT 6DP 2NR
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM #2)
- TORGERSON
- DP: TAYLOR, HALFORD; NR: ELLIS,
- JUD RPT 2DP 2NR
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, THERRIAULT, MASEK
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 259(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/00
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- WILLIAMS, PHILLIPS
- NR: BUNDE, AUSTERMAN, MOSES, DAVIS,
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, GRUSSENDORF;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 6NR
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- CORRECTED JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 1/28/00
- DP: KOTT, GREEN, CROFT, JAMES
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 1/28/00
- DP: GREEN, CROFT, KERTTULA, KOTT
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- OGAN; NR: KERTTULA; AM: SMALLEY
- DP: JAMES, GREEN, HUDSON, WHITAKER,
- STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP 1NR 1AM
On January 10, 2000 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/99