+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1NR
- DP: LEDOUX, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER
- NR: FOSTER
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS, REINBOLD
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor