+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: TIM KELLY, PHILLIPS, MACKIE;
- NR: HOFFMAN
- HOUSE FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, FIN
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 255(CRA)
- PASSED Y37 E3
- COSPONSOR(S): MOSES, CROFT, GREEN,
- BARNES, JAMES, KEMPLEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, AUSTERMAN, HALCRO
On March 21, 2000 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(CRA) NT 8DP 2NR
- DP: MULDER, THERRIAULT, AUSTERMAN,
- DAVIES, MOSES, FOSTER, WILLIAMS,
- PHILLIPS; NR: BUNDE, GRUSSENDORF
- FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 2/25/00
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: DYSON, KOOKESH, MURKOWSKI, HARRIS;
- NR: JOULE, MORGAN
- FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, MURKOWSKI,
- MORGAN
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS
On January 10, 2000 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/99
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor