+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/00
- 10:05AM 5/25/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 114 SLA 00
On May 2, 2000 in the House:
- THERRIAULT
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER, ROKEBERG,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADOPTED Y36 A4 CCS HB 253
On April 30, 2000 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC REPORT ADPTD Y14 N2 E3 A1 CCS HB 253
On April 28, 2000 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 A1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *MILLER, LEMAN, ELTON
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- *DYSON, GREEN, CROFT
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N39 E1
On April 25, 2000 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- MOVED DOWN THE CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, WILKEN,
- LEMAN, PHILLIPS, PETE KELLY, WARD
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 4/21/00
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N2 A1
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 253(HES) AM S
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- NR: WILKEN, ELTON
- DP: MILLER, PEARCE, PETE KELLY;
- HES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): SMALLEY, PHILLIPS,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 N5 E2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- PASSED Y31 N6 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 253(JUD)
- JAMES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, KOHRING, OGAN
On March 31, 2000 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/3 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/00
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 4NR
- DP: KOTT; NR: CROFT, GREEN, JAMES,
- KERTTULA
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 1/21/00
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HES
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- DP: GREEN, DYSON, COGHILL, WHITAKER
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor