+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (REV)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
On April 15, 2012 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR UNAN CONSENT
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
- RLS RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 40
- DP: ELLIS, HOFFMAN, STEVENS, MEYER, STEDMAN
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(S.RLS)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S) WITHDRAWN: DYSON, DAVIS
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 252(RLS)
- PASSED Y18 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 252(RLS)
On April 15, 2012 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN2: (REV)
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- FIN RPT SCS (L&C) 3DP 2NR
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: EGAN, DAVIS, MENARD
- L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: GIESSEL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, MCGUIRE
- FN2: (REV)
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, DAVIS, ELLIS
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2012
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 252(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, KAWASAKI, KERTTULA, MILLETT, GARDNER, JOHANSEN, SADDLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 252(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 E3
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 3NR
- NR: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, NEUMAN
- FN2: (REV)
- COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
- FN1: (REV)
- NR: CHENAULT
- DP: THOMPSON, JOHNSON, SADDLER, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 1NR
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/12
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor