+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 66 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/04
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 252(JUD)
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 252(JUD)
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DP 4NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 24
- DP: SEEKINS; NR: THERRIAULT, ELLIS,
- FRENCH, OGAN
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, STEVENS G; NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 252(STA)
- PASSED Y26 E3 A11
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 252(STA)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1NR
- DP: DAHLSTROM, LYNN, SEATON, WEYHRAUCH;
- NR: BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP
- DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, STA
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor