+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/28/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/30 CHAPTER 11 SLA 06
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- 12:56 PM 3/29/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 28, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E2 A3
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 251(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y17 N2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 251(RES)
On March 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2006
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/20 CALENDAR
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- DP: WAGONER, ELTON, KOOKESH, DYSON, SEEKINS, STEDMAN, STEVENS B
- RES RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 29, 2005 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 251(RES)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 251(RES)
- PASSED Y32 N1 E2 A5
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 25, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: OLSON, CRAWFORD
- DP: ELKINS, LEDOUX, RAMRAS, SAMUELS;
- RES RPT CS(RES) 4DP 2NR
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELKINS
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: THOMAS
- DP: WILSON, HARRIS, ELKINS;
- FSH RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS