+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On October 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- ADVISORY COMMITTEE MEMBERS (SEE JOURNAL - 28TH LEGISLATURE):
- HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/3/12
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/2 CHAPTER 12 SLA 12
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- 10:18 AM 4/24/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 14, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A1 V1
On April 13, 2012 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 250(FIN)
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 250(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N-
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- NR: OLSON
- FN2: (CED)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- MENARD, PASKVAN, DYSON, WAGONER, STEVENS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, MEYER, ELLIS,
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ENE CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 250(ENE)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 250(ENE)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, MUNOZ, LYNN, KAWASAKI, SADDLER, GRUENBERG, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, COSTELLO, SEATON
- FN2: (CED)
- JOULE, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- DP: T.WILSON, FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN,
- FIN RPT CS(ENE) 11DP
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TUCK
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: OLSON, LYNN, TUCK, PETERSEN, FOSTER, PRUITT
- ENE RPT CS(ENE) 6DP
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, MILLER
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- ENE, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/12
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor