+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 9:55 AM 7/2/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 62 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 250(HSS) AM
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, STEDMAN, EGAN, BISHOP, GARDNER, MCGUIRE,
- COGHILL, MICCICHE, DYSON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 250(HSS) AM
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 250(HSS)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED Y34 E3 A3
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 E3 A4
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX, HERRON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 250(HSS) AM
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 2NR
- DP: FOSTER, GRUENBERG, KELLER
- NR: LEDOUX, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 6DP
- DP: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, JUD
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor