+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/11 CHAPTER 34 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/9/00
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- 3:45 PM 4/26/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 25
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PEARCE, ELLIS,
- ELTON, PARNELL, TIM KELLY, MACKIE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR
- DP: TORGERSON, LEMAN, ADAMS, WILKEN;
- NR: PHILLIPS, GREEN, DONLEY
- HOUSE ZERO FNS (H.RES/DCED, F&G)
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 4DP
- DP: TIM KELLY, PHILLIPS, HOFFMAN,
- MACKIE
- HOUSE ZERO FNS (H.RES/DCED, F&G)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN
On February 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, FIN
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 25
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): SMALLEY, BUNDE, DAVIS,
- GREEN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP 2NR
- DP: HUDSON, JOULE, KAPSNER, WHITAKER,
- HARRIS, MORGAN, COWDERY; NR: BARNES,
- MASEK
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (H.RES/DCED, F&G)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- CRA RPT 7DP
- DP: JOULE, DYSON, KOOKESH, MORGAN,
- MURKOWSKI, HALCRO, HARRIS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCRA)
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/99
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CRA, RES
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor