+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 38 SLA 97
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 1/1/98
On May 6, 1997 in the House:
- 8:15 AM 5/6/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 25(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: HALFORD, LEMAN, GREEN, SHARP
- NR: TORGERSON; AM: TAYLOR
- (H) ZERO FNS (DPS, F&G)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 25(RES)
- PASSED Y38 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MULDER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 24, 1997 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, WILLIAMS, BARNES, MASEK,
- OGAN, HUDSON, NICHOLIA, JOULE; NR: GREEN
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, F&G) 2/5/97
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- FSH RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, AUSTERMAN; NR: KUBINA, IVAN
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DPS, F&G)
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FSH, RESOURCES, FINANCE