+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/23/96
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 98 SLA 96
- 10:40 AM 6/13/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y13 N7
- CROSS SPONSOR: LINCOLN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 249(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/7/96
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/96
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (REV)
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR 1DNP
On March 12, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV) 3/11/96
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y31 N6 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 249(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/96
On May 2, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- NR: KOTT
- NR: ROKEBERG, ELTON, MASEK, SANDERS
- DP: KUBINA
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 1DP 5NR
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)