+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/22/05
- 4:15 PM 6/15/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 55 SLA 05
On May 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y16 N3 E1
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/8/05
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- STEVENS G NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N3 E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 249(RLS)
On May 8, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 249(RLS)
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- AM: WILKEN
- FIN RPT 2DP 1AM 3NR
- DP: GREEN, DYSON
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON, STEDMAN
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2005
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 30, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 2DP 3NR
- DP: KERTTULA, ROKEBERG;
- NR: HARRIS, COGHILL, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2005
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 249(RLS)
- PASSED Y31 N4 E2 A3
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
- VERSION: CSHB 249(RLS)
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 4NR
- DP: LYNN, ANDERSON;
- NR: CRAWFORD, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- AM: NEUMAN
- NR: LEDOUX, SALMON;
- DP: CISSNA, OLSON, THOMAS;
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 3DP 2NR 1AM
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- CRA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS