+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/7/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 53 SLA 03
- 8:30 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 248
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N7
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 248
- PASSED Y13 N7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y20 N-
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- BUNDE; NR: WILKEN, OLSON
- DP: GREEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, STEVENS B,
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY;
- NR: GUESS, DYSON
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 248
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N11
- PASSED Y26 N14
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 248
On April 25, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 22, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- WEYHRAUCH
- DP: SEATON; NR: HOLM, BERKOWITZ,
- STA RPT 1DP 3NR
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor