+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, TUCK
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK, GATTIS
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14