+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/1 CHAPTER 11 SLA 12
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/12
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- FN3: (DOT)
- FN4: (DOT)
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- 10:18 AM 4/24/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2012
- FN5: (DOT)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 246(FIN) AM S
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 246(FIN) AM S
On April 15, 2012 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 V1
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 33
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- FN3: (DOT)
- FN4: (DOT)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMAS, STEDMAN
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 3DP
- DP: KOOKESH, THOMAS, MENARD
- FN2: (DOT)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 246(FIN)
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, AUSTERMAN, KERTTULA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 246(FIN)
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP
- DP: GUTTENBERG, COSTELLO, GARA, NEUMAN, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN2: (DOT)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DICK
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- TRA RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: JOHNSON, FEIGE, PRUITT, MUNOZ, PETERSEN, P.WILSON
- NR: GRUENBERG
- FN1: (DOT)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/12
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN