+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 15
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS(JUD) 3NR 1DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- NR: HOLLAND, HUGHES, SHOWER
- DP: KIEHL
- AM: MYERS
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- FN2: (DPS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y30 N8 E2
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y32 N6 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 N1 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 246(FIN)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR
On April 15, 2022 in the House:
- TECHNICAL SESSION 4/15 - ON 4/19 CALENDAR
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 246(FIN)
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/15 CALENDAR
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED Y25 N6 E7 A2
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N22 E8
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL, SNYDER, TUCK, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL
- NR: LEBON, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- FN2: (DPS)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- DP: DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER, CLAMAN
- NR: EASTMAN, VANCE
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- FN2: (DPS)
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor