+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (74)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 43 SLA 03
- 11:31 AM 6/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N8 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N5 E2
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSHB 245(JUD) AM S
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y11 N9
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 245(JUD) AM S
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FIN RPT 3DP 3DNP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, BUNDE, STEVENS B; NR: WILKEN
- DNP: TAYLOR, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y13 N7
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: THERRIAULT, OGAN
- DP: SEEKINS; DNP: FRENCH;
- JUD RPT 1DP 1DNP 2NR
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N16 E3
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N13 E3
- VERSION: CSHB 245(JUD)(EFD FLD)
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N9 E4
- PASSED Y21 N15 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 245(JUD)
On May 12, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2003
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- DP: MEYER, FOSTER, WHITAKER, HARRIS,
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- DP: MCGUIRE; DNP: GRUENBERG, GARA;
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 2DNP 3NR
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: SAMUELS, HOLM, OGG
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: MASEK; AM: WEYHRAUCH, FATE
- DP: LYNN; DNP: GRUENBERG, CISSNA;
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 1DP 2DNP 1NR 2AM
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM) RECEIVED
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
- FN2: ZERO(DNR)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- MLV, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor