+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/10/12
- 11:10 AM 6/4/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/12 CHAPTER 62 SLA 12
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 245(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 245(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR
- NR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, OLSON, ELLIS
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- DP: THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE
On March 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, JOULE, STOLTZE,
- THOMAS
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2012
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 245(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, JOHNSON
- VERSION: CSHB 245(FIN)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT 6DP
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/12