+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (63)
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/17/02
- CHAPTER 2 SLA 02
- RETURNED TO GOVERNOR 1/17/02
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- GOVERNOR VETO OVERRIDDEN Y41 N18 E1
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 7/5/01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 244(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N6
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 244(RES)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TAYLOR,
- PASSED Y13 N6 A1
- WARD
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- A1
On May 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- ADVANCED TO 3RD READING FLD Y11 N5 A4
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2OR 5/6/01
On May 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN3: (DNR)
- NR: AUSTERMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, WILKEN, WARD;
- FIN RPT SCS(RES) 4DP 3NR
On May 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, HALFORD;
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- DNP: ELTON; NR: PEARCE; AM: LINCOLN
- FN2: (DNR)
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 29, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 244(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N1 E2 A6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 244(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/01
On April 28, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COGHILL
On April 27, 2001 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 2NR
- WILLIAMS; NR: DAVIES, HUDSON
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, FOSTER,
- FN2: (DNR)
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HAYES
- FN1: (DNR)
- DP: STEVENS, GREEN, FATE, MASEK, SCALZI
- RES RPT 5DP
On April 23, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCALZI
On April 20, 2001 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS, WILSON
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: KOOKESH, KAPSNER
- DP: SCALZI, MASEK, KOHRING;
- TRA RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- TRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor