+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 40 SLA 14
- 3:27 PM 6/12/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 A5
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 244(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 244(FIN)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N29 E4 V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 244
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
- VERSION: HB 244
- PASSED Y34 N1 E4 V1
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- DNP: GUTTENBERG
- DP: T.WILSON, HOLMES, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, MUNOZ, COSTELLO, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT 8DP 1DNP 2NR
- NR: GARA, AUSTERMAN
- FN1: (DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR)
- NR: KAWASAKI, TARR
- DP: JOHNSON, HAWKER, P.WILSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE
- RES RPT 6DP 2NR
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, P.WILSON
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor