+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 9:20 AM 7/8/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 139 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/04
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 242(L&C)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 242(L&C)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, STEVENS G;
- NR: DAVIS, FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 242(L&C)
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 242(L&C)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 7DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor