+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
- 11:17 AM 6/12/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 33 SLA 14
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 241
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 241
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, OLSON
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- DP: DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, MICCICHE
- L&C RPT 3DP
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 241
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: HB 241
- PASSED Y34 E6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, GARA, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE
- FIN RPT 8DP
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: REINBOLD, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 4DP
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14