+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- 10:45 AM 8/22/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 9/4 CHAPTER 100 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, OLSON, MEYER, HUGHES, BISHOP
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 240(FIN)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- FN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEVENS, GARDNER, EGAN, KELLY
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, STUTES, KOPP, TUCK, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 240(FIN)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 3NR
- DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
- NR: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KNOPP
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, KITO
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: WOOL, KITO
- DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- NR: STUTES, KNOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor