+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
On September 10, 2013 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 51 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/13
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- 11:51 AM 6/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 24(JUD)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y15 N4 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 24(JUD)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2013
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- NR: OLSON
- DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 24(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N4 E4 A3
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 24(JUD)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
- PASSED Y33 N5 E2
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- TAKE UP RECON SAME DAY WITHDRAWN
- COSPONSOR(S): HIGGINS, OLSON
- MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/20 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2013
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, THOMPSON, STOLTZE
- NR: HOLMES, MUNOZ, GARA, KAWASAKI, AUSTERMAN
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 5NR
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, REINBOLD
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 7DP
- DP: MILLETT, GRUENBERG, PRUITT, LYNN, FOSTER, LEDOUX, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, COSTELLO
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor