+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: (EED)
- NR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, WOOL, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- DP: HANNAN, GILLIS, STORY, FIELDS, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP
- FN2: (EED)
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: REVAK, HOPKINS
- DP: TUCK, ZULKOSKY, JOHNSON, STORY, DRUMMOND
- EDC RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- EDC, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor