+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FAILED Y12 N8
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/94
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On May 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FN (F&G)
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR (RES)SCS
- FN (UPDATED) TO HB & SCS PUBLISHED (F&G)
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN APPLIES TO SCS (F&G)
- RES RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- AMENDMENT NO 2 BY ULMER
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 Y24 N16
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y34 N6
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 19, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N24
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY FINKELSTEIN
- PASSED Y36 N4
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- ULMER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 239(RES)
On April 8, 1993 in the House:
- DP: LARSON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 2DP 1DNP 4NR
- DNP: MARTIN
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, THERRIAULT, MACLEAN
- -PREVIOUS FN (F&G) 4/2/93
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 4/2/93
- NR: GREEN, JAMES, FINKELSTEIN
- DP: BUNDE, WILLIAMS
- DP: HUDSON, CARNEY, DAVIES, MULDER
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 3NR
On March 31, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On March 19, 1993 in the House:
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)