+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- FN3: (S.FIN/DHS)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/8/18
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 8 SLA 18
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- 9:37 AM 5/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 236(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FN3: (S.FIN/DHS)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- STEDMAN, HUGHES, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, WILSON, OLSON, MEYER, MACKINNON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, KELLY, GIESSEL, STEVENS, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, COSTELLO
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS RPT 4DP 1AM
- DP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SPOHNHOLZ
- AM: EASTMAN
- FN1: (DHS)
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP
- DP: TILTON, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, KAWASAKI, GARA, WILSON, FOSTER,
- SEATON
- FN2: (DHS)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 2/7/2018
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, GARA, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, PARISH, TARR, MILLETT, SEATON,
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 236(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 N1 E4
- MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N1 E4
- WOOL, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 236(FIN)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor