+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/30/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 77 SLA 93
- 1:20 PM 6/3/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 N-
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 5/10/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 235(HES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On May 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H&S ZERO FNS APPLY (ADM, DOE)
- FIN RPT 5DP (HES)SCS
On April 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS (DOE)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SCS (ADM)
- HES RPT SCS 4NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On April 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS (DOE)
- STA RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS, HES, FINANCE
On April 5, 1993 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- B.DAVIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 235(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/93
On March 30, 1993 in the House:
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 6NR
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DOE) 3/24/93
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: NAVARRE, FOSTER
On March 24, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 3/24/93
- NR: B.DAVIS, BRICE, OLBERG
- NR: KOTT, VEZEY, G.DAVIS, TOOHEY
- DP: BUNDE
- HES RPT CS(HES) 1DP 7NR
On March 17, 1993 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor