+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, EDGMON, SNYDER
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, PRAX
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, CRONK, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEBON
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY, VANCE, SHAW, TILTON, CLAMAN, TARR
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor