+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- RETURN TO GOVERNOR 5/20/20 FOR PERMANENT FILING
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 7 SLA 20
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 4:45 P.M. 3/31/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- CBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y27 N11 E2
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E2
- RESCIND ACTION PASSAGE ON CONCUR Y23 N15 E2
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- CBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y16 N- E4
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, BISHOP
- NR: WILSON
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 234(FIN)
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- MOTION TO DIVIDE QUESTION (FLD) Y15 N23 E2
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 234(FIN)(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- CBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y28 N10 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2
- MOTION TO (ADP/FLD) CBRF SECTION(S)
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N10 E2
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 41(C)
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 13
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N34 E3
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 4AM
- DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER, JOHNSTON
- AM: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N36 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 234(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 N2 E3
- CBRF SECTION(S) (ADP) Y35 N2 E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 234(FIN)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor