+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/03/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/5 CHAPTER 63 SLA 95
On May 15, 1995 in the House:
- 9:40 AM 5/15/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 234(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/95
On May 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR
- F&G, DHSS, LABOR, LAW, DPS, DOT, DNR)
- (H) ZERO FNS (DCED-4, DOE-2, ADM, DEC,
On April 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 13, 1995 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 12, 1995 in the House:
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/95
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y25 E1 A14
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 234(JUD)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/8/95
- DOT) 3/6/95
- ADM, DEC, F&G, DHSS, LABOR, LAW, DPS,
- 14 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (4-DCED, 2-DOE,
- AM: VEZEY
- DP: PORTER, BUNDE, TOOHEY, FINKELSTEIN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1AM
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- NR: IVAN
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: JAMES, GREEN, ROBINSON
- DOT) 3/6/95
- 14 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (4-DCED, 2-DOE,
- ADM, DEC, F&G, DHSS, LABOR, LAW, DPS,
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR) 3/8/95
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- 4-DCED, 2-DOE)
- DHSS, LABOR, LAW, DPS, DOT,
- 14 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (ADM, DEC, F&G,
- STATE AFFAIRS, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor