+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (58)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
- 4:34 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 58 SLA 04
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 233(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 233(FIN)
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y29 N9 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): WEYHRAUCH
On May 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- FN5: (EED) CORRECTED
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
- FN3: (MVA)
- NR: DYSON; AM: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN4: (EED)
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELTON
- FRENCH, STEVENS G, WAGONER, SEEKINS,
- BUNDE, GUESS, STEVENS B, STEDMAN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, COWDERY,
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/9/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN2: (H.RLS/EED)
- EDU CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- VERSION: CSHB 233(EDU) AM
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 233(EDU) AM
- PASSED Y35 E5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, SEATON, GARA,
- CROFT, OGG, KOOKESH, KAPSNER, CRAWFORD,
- MEYER, MASEK, JOULE, LYNN, GUTTENBERG,
- KOHRING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(EDU) 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: SEATON, WOLF, GATTO; NR: COGHILL;
- AM: CISSNA
- FN1: (EED)
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF, DAHLSTROM
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, MCGUIRE
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (EED)
- KAPSNER, GATTO
- DP: WILSON, OGG, SEATON, WOLF,
- EDU RPT CS(EDU) 6DP
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- EDU, HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor