+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On September 27, 1995 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 93 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/29/95
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- 10:10 AM 6/13/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y20 N-
- ..CSHB 233 (FIN) AM
- RECEDED FROM (S) AM AND PASSED Y13 N7
On May 16, 1995 in the House:
- *OGAN,KELLY,GRUSSENDORF
- H FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y7 N12 E1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *RIEGER,KELLY,SALO
- S LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- H LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- *KOTT,MARTIN,DAVIES
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N37 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED Y11 N8 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 233(FIN)AMS
- (S) ADOPTED LETTER OF INTENT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FNS (ADM, DOT)
- (H) FNS (DOE, DCED)
- FN TO SCS (DEC)
- FIN RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED PASSED Y23 N17
- RET 2ND RESCIND ACTION/PASSING AM 1/UC
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y23 N17
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N14 E4 A7
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/95
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y35 N1 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MULDER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 233(FIN) AM
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- DP: KELLY, THERRIAULT, FOSTER, PARNELL
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 8DP 1AM
- DP: HANLEY, MARTIN, KOHRING, NAVARRE
- AM: BROWN
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (DCED, DOE)
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (ADM, DOT) 3/20/95
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- 2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (ADM, DOT)
- 2 FISCAL NOTES (DEC, DCED)
- NR: SANDERS
- DP: KOTT, ROKEBERG, KUBINA
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 1NR
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor