+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- 2:00 P.M. 4/7/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/20 CHAPTER 15 SLA 20
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/19/20
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 232(L&C)
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 232(L&C)
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, REVAK
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 232(L&C)
- PASSED Y31 N4 E3 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KOPP, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 232(L&C)
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL, JOSEPHSON, STORY
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR
- DP: FIELDS, HANNAN, STORY, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ
- NR: GILLIS, RASMUSSEN
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- ENE RPT CS(ENE) NT 5DP 1NR
- DP: FIELDS, LINCOLN, SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS
- NR: RAUSCHER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- ENE, L&C
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor