+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 3:20 PM 8/5/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/6 CHAPTER 149 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/04
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/21/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 232(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 232(FIN)
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 16
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, STEVENS B, BUNDE
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/REV)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: BUNDE, STEVENS G; NR: SEEKINS
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/REV)
On May 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 232
- PASSED Y34 E5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 232
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 8DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, MOSES,
- CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/REV)
On April 28, 2003 in the House:
- L&C RPT 7DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG,
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN1: ZERO(H.L&C/REV)
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor