+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 28, 1999 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
On July 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H) FOR PERMANENT FILING
On May 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- JOURNAL CORRECTION
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 231(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N17
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y13 N7
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 3 FAILED Y7 N13
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N17
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 AS AMENDED FAILED Y4 N16
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 6 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y9 N11
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 7 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED Y12 N8
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- FAILED PASSAGE Y7 N13
On May 19, 1999 in the House:
- TO BE CONSIDERED: 1ST SPECIAL SESSION
On May 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 3NR 2AM 1DP IF AM
- DP: PARNELL, TORGERSON, PETE KELLY;
- NR: ADAMS, LEMAN, WILKEN;
- DP IF AM: PHILLIPS; AM: GREEN, DONLEY
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
On May 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 15, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- DP: MULDER, BUNDE, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS,
- FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/GOV)
- NR: THERRIAULT, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- WILLIAMS; DNP: MOSES, FOSTER, KOHRING;
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N30 E1 A2
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 3DNP 3NR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 231(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y27 N12 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 8, 1999 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor