+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- 10:30 AM 5/17/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/9/94
On May 7, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y27 N11 E1 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y19 N1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES RPT 3CAL 1NR 5/5/94
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 230(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y19 N1
- ZHAROFF NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H FN (F&G)
- FIN RPT 6DP
On April 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/9/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 230(FIN)
- PASSED Y36 N3 A1
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 2/4/94
- NR: HANLEY, MARTIN, PARNELL,GRUSSENDORF
- DP: THERRIAULT, NAVARRE
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, HOFFMAN, BROWN
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 6DP 4NR
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 6DP
- DP: BUNDE, WILLIAMS
- DP: HUDSON, CARNEY, GREEN, FINKELSTEIN
- -PREVIOUS FN (F&G) 4/2/93
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 4/2/93
- NR: PHILLIPS, OLBERG
- DP: MOSES
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 1DP 2NR
On March 15, 1993 in the House:
- FISHERIES, RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor