+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 5/13/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 65 SLA 97
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 9/2/97
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(RES)
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1NR 5/2/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FAILED Y14 N5 E1
- THIRD READING 5/5 CALENDAR
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: HALFORD, TAYLOR, LEMAN, SHARP, GREEN
- NR: LINCOLN
- (H) ZERO FN (H.RES/DNR)
On April 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(RES)
- PASSED Y29 N5 E4 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 27, 1997 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FLD Y23 N9 E6 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/2 CALENDAR
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, MASEK, OGAN, HUDSON
- NR: JOULE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES/DNR)
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES, FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor