+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 26 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/26/03
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/7/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 23(JUD)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- OGAN, COWDERY, OLSON
- WAGONER, ELTON, LINCOLN, FRENCH, TAYLOR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, SEEKINS,
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(JUD)
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- HOFFMAN, OLSON, STEVENS B
- DP: WILKEN, BUNDE; NR: GREEN, TAYLOR,
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: THERRIAULT, OGAN, FRENCH, ELLIS
- DP: SEEKINS;
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 14, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 23(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, MCGUIRE, SEATON
- PASSED Y34 E4 A1 V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2003
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- DP: GARA, GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor