+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/08/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 22 SLA 95
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- 9:42 AM 4/28/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/95
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY, TAYLOR,
- MILLER, TORGERSON, KELLY
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On April 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (DCED)
- JUD RPT 3DP
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (DCED)
- L&C RPT 4DP
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/95
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
- PASSED Y35 E5
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 2/8/95
- DP: TOOHEY, VEZEY, BUNDE, GREEN
- DP: FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS, PORTER
- JUD RPT 7DP
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- DP: ROBINSON, BRICE
- DP: ROKEBERG, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- HES RPT 6DP
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 6, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (6)
G.DAVIS BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor