+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (103)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 11:17 AM 6/12/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 51 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/14
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- FCC REPORT: FCCS HB 23
- FCC REPORT READ
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B)
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y14 N4 E2 FCCS HB 23
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- FCC REPORT: FCCS HB 23 (RECEIVED 9:30 AM)
- UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B) WAIVED
- FN7: ZERO(DOT)
- FN8: (FCC/REV)
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONSIDER FCC REPORT
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y28 N10 E2 FCCS HB 23
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B)
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- MCGUIRE (CHAIR), MICCICHE, GARDNER
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y20 N18 E2
- UNIFORM RULE 42(A) & (B) WAIVED
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- AUSTERMAN (CHAIR), STOLTZE, DRUMMOND
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS 2D CSHB 23(FIN) AM S
On April 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS 2D CSHB 23(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMDS UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1DNP 1NR NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 21
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH
- DNP: OLSON
- NR: HOFFMAN
- FN6: (REV)
- FN7: ZERO(DOT)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- RLS RPT 2D CS(RLS) NT 2DP 5NR
- DP: KELLER, JOHNSON
- NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, HAWKER, OLSON, GRUENBERG
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN4: (REV)
- FN5: (REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(FIN)
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION UNAN CONSENT
- RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING FIN CS UC
- MOTION TO ADOPT CS(FIN) WITHDRAWN UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR CS UNAN CONSENT
- 2D CS(RLS) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N30 E1
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y24 N15 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: 2D CSHB 23(RLS)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN RULES
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN RULES
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 1NR 6AM
- DP: NEUMAN, T.WILSON, STOLTZE
- NR: THOMPSON
- AM: KAWASAKI, HOLMES, MUNOZ, EDGMON, GARA, COSTELLO
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN3: (DOT)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP 2AM
- DP: LYNN, JOHNSON, GATTIS, ISAACSON, P.WILSON
- AM: FEIGE, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN