+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 14 SLA 17
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- 8:33 AM 6/15/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N2
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 23(FIN)
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 23(FIN)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR
On April 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN5: (GOV/FUND CAP)
- FN4: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- AM: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1AM SAME TITLE
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR: COGHILL BEFORE MICCICHE
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEVENS, GARDNER,
- BISHOP, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, MEYER, KELLY,
- VON IMHOF, DUNLEAVY, MACKINNON, STEDMAN
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y8 N32
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N30
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N29
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N28
- VERSION: CSHB 23(FIN) AM
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, FANSLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
- HELD TO 3/13 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2017
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- AM: TILTON, WILSON, PRUITT
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3AM
- DP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER
- FN3: (GOV/FUND CAP)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG, MILLETT
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRENN
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor