+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 16, 2023 in the House:
- 3:10 P.M. 7/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 18 SLA 23
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, SHOWER, KAUFMAN, GIESSEL, OLSON
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 23
On May 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL
On May 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, BJORKMAN, MERRICK
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, CLAMAN, BISHOP, KAWASAKI,
- WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, KIEHL, DUNBAR, STEVENS
On March 31, 2023 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2023
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
- PASSED Y36 E4
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, JOSEPHSON, STUTES, TILTON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 23
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: STORY, WRIGHT, C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, SHAW
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE, EDGMON, CARPENTER, FOSTER, PRAX, COULOMBE, ALLARD,
- SUMNER, SHAW, CRONK, D.JOHNSON, MEARS, STORY, TOMASZEWSKI, MCCORMICK,
- ARMSTRONG, GRAY, GALVIN
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GROH
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor