+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC, FIN
- REFERRED TO EDUCATION
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 229(EDC)
- PASSED Y23 N9 E8
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 229(EDC)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 2 OFFERED AND RULED OUT OF ORDER
- SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y19 N12 E8 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): WOOL, SPOHNHOLZ
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 6DP 4NR
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, MERRICK, FOSTER
- NR: LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, RASMUSSEN
- FN2: (GOV/FUND CAP)
- FN3: (EED)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 4DP 1DNP 2NR
- DP: ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, DRUMMOND, STORY
- DNP: GILLHAM
- NR: CRONK, PRAX
- FN1: (EED)
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STORY, SCHRAGE
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC, FIN