+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(MLV) NT 4DP 3NR
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, DAHLSTROM,
- CRAWFORD; NR: SEATON, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM/ALL DEPTS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: DAHLSTROM, CISSNA, GRUENBERG,
- LYNN; NR: MASEK, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM/ALL DEPTS)
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, STA, FIN