+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (55)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 11:55 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 64 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/21/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 226
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 226
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- NR: OLSON
- FN2: (H.FIN/DNR)
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B,
- WAGONER, DYSON, LINCOLN, ELTON
- FN2: (H.FIN/DNR)
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ADOPTING AM NO 1 UC
- RESCIND ADOPTING AM NO 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 E5 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 226
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 226
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y36 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, SEATON,
- DAHLSTROM, MASEK, CRAWFORD, WILSON,
- GARA, LYNN
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 8DP
- DP: HAWKER, STOLTZE, CROFT, MOSES,
- CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS
- FN2: (H.FIN/DNR)
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 8DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, HEINZE, MORGAN,
- MASEK, KERTTULA, GUTTENBERG, FATE
- FN1: (DNR)
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: WILSON
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor