+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN3: (DHS)
- FN2: (DHS)
- FN1: (DHS)
- DP: TARR, STUTES, VAZQUEZ, TALERICO, FOSTER, WOOL, SEATON
- HSS RPT 7DP
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): STUTES, VAZQUEZ
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, DRUMMOND, TARR
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/16
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor