+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (60)
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/28/96
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/30 CHAPTER 16 SLA 96
On April 12, 1996 in the House:
- 2:25 PM 4/11/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y26 N11 E2 A1
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR AM OF (S) WITHDRAWN
On April 3, 1996 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N9
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y13 N7
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 226(JUD)
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN TO SCS (ADM/ALL AGENCIES)
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 2NR 3/29/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N7 E1
- THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On March 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP 1NR 1DNP SAME TITLE
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y24 N13 E3
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- BROWN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y24 N14 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 226(FIN) AM
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- FIN CS ADOPTED Y24 N15 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N25
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NOS 2 & 3 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FAILED Y26 N14
- THIRD READING 2/29 CALENDAR
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM/ALL DEPTS)
- AM: NAVARRE
- NR: GRUSSENDORF
- DNP: BROWN
- DP: KELLY
- DP: FOSTER, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
On April 26, 1995 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 1DP 4NR 2AM
- DP: TOOHEY
- NR: PORTER, BUNDE, FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- AM: VEZEY, GREEN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM/ALL DEPTS) 3/20/95
On April 25, 1995 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On April 21, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM/ALL DEPTS) 3/20/95
- AM: VEZEY
- NR: G.DAVIS, BUNDE, ROBINSON, BRICE
- DP: TOOHEY
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 1DP 4NR 1AM
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM/ALL DEPTS)
- AM: ROBINSON
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, GREEN, IVAN
- STA RPT 4DP 1AM
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, HES, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor