+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/26/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 44 SLA 95
On May 10, 1995 in the House:
- 9:30 AM 5/10/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RIEGER, TAYLOR
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 225(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/95
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- (H) ZERO FN (F&G)
- RES RPT 4DP
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN, HALFORD
On April 8, 1995 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/08/95
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 225(RES)
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
- DP: DAVIES, WILLIAMS, KOTT, OGAN, GREEN
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WILLIS
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (6)
KOHRING BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor